Back to profile
Ancillary activitities - prof.dr.ir. GMJ (Frits) Mohren
-
01-10-2023/31-08-2026
ondersteuning leden Algemeen Bestuur Waterschap Vallei en Veluwe -
01-11-2020/01-12-2025
Advisor Vereniging Het Ree -
01-09-2019/31-08-2025
Member of Advisory Board Stichting Probos -
01-11-2018/01-11-2024
Member, Council for Advice on forest management Kroondomein Het Loo -
01-11-2018/01-11-2024
Lid, advisering Bosbeheer Staatsdomeinen Het Loo -
01-01-2018/31-12-2024
Chair Forest Management advisory committee Staatsbosbeheer -
01-12-2014/01-12-2024
Member of the board of the foundation "Jachtexamens" Stichting Jachtexamens -
01-12-2010/31-12-2024
Member of the board of the foundation "Toekomstboom" Stichting Toekomstboom